MO SB84 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 84-Kraus, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Restricts the use of cell site simulator devices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts the use of cell site simulator devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - House: SB 84 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseS Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 84-Kraus, with HCS, as amended
2017-05-12HouseH Third Read and Passed
2017-05-12HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2017-05-12HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dogan)--(0052H03.01H)
2017-05-10HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-10HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-03HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2017-05-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-05-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-04-25HouseHearing Conducted H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-04-11HouseReferred H Crime Prevention and Public Safety
2017-04-10HouseH Second Read
2017-04-06HouseH First Read
2017-04-06SenateS Third Read and Passed
2017-04-03SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-04-03SenatePerfected
2017-04-03SenateSCS S adopted
2017-03-30SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2017-02-16SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS
2017-02-16SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0052S.02C)
2017-02-06SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-30SenateHearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2017-01-04SenateS First Read--SB 84-Kraus
2016-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback