MO SB829 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to burden of proof in tax liability cases
Title
Modifies provisions relating to burden of proof in tax liability cases
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] | Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | House | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2014-09-10 | House | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-09-10 | House | S adopted motion to override Governor's Veto |
2014-06-11 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee |
2014-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Ways and Means Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Referred H Ways and Means Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-03 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-01 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-03-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (5863S.02C) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | S First Read--SB 829-Kraus |