MO SB822 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the Senior Citizen Property Tax Relief Credit
Title
Modifies the Senior Citizen Property Tax Relief Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development and Tax Policy Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |