MO SB818 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 818-Lembke, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 818-Lembke, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions relating to the initiative and referendum process
Title
Modifies various provisions relating to the initiative and referendum process
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Lembke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 818-Lembke, with SCS, SS for SCS & SA 1 (pending) | |
2010-04-27 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Dempsey) | |
2010-04-27 | SS for SCS S offered (Lembke)--(4633S.05F) | |
2010-03-02 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-02-22 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (4633.02C) | |
2010-02-15 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2010-01-25 | S First Read--SB 818-Lembke |