MO SB8 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-25 - Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SS for SCS for SB 8-Mayer, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede and pass the bill)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-25 - Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SS for SCS for SB 8-Mayer, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede and pass the bill)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of Missouri tax credit programs in accordance with recommendations made by the Missouri Tax Credit Review Commission Report
Title
Modifies provisions of Missouri tax credit programs in accordance with recommendations made by the Missouri Tax Credit Review Commission Report
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-25 | Requests to Recede or Grant Conference Calendar--SS for SCS for SB 8-Mayer, with HCS, as amended (Senate requests House recede and pass the bill) | |
2011-10-17 | S requests H recede and take up and pass bill | |
2011-10-17 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-10-06 | H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated | |
2011-10-06 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-10-06 | HA 13 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Kelly-24)--(0031L15.31H) | |
2011-10-06 | HSA 1 for HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(0031L15.09F) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 12 to HCS H offered (Korman)--(0031L15.43H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 11 to HCS H offered & defeated (Oxford)--(0031L15.04F) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 10 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-10-06 | HA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Leara)--(0031L15.47H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 10 to HCS H offered (Zerr)--(0031L15.04H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Long)--(0031L15.45H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-10-06 | HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schneider)--(0031L14.53H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 8 to HCS H offered (Brandom)--(0031L15.41H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-10-06 | HA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(0031L15.48H) | |
2011-10-06 | HSA 1 for HA 7 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Webber)--(0031L15.44H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 7 to HCS H offered (Solon)--(0031L15.24H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-10-06 | HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(0031L15.58H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 6 to HCS H offered (Schieffer)--(0031L15.46H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (White)--(0031L15.21H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 4 to HCS H adopted | |
2011-10-06 | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Brattin)--(0031L15.51H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Koenig)--(0031L15.29H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sater)--(0031L15.01L) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Silvey)--(0031L15.39H) | |
2011-10-06 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Bahr)--(0031L15.30H) | |
2011-10-06 | Laid over | |
2011-10-06 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-10-06 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-10-05 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-10-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-10-05 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-10-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-19 | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-15 | Referred H Economic Development Committee | |
2011-09-15 | H Second Read | |
2011-09-14 | H First Read | |
2011-09-14 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-09-14 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-09-14 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-09-14 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-09-13 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-09-13 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-09-13 | Perfected | |
2011-09-13 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2011-09-13 | SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0031S07.27S) | |
2011-09-13 | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Richard)--(0031S07.26S) | |
2011-09-13 | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Green)--(0031S07.11S) | |
2011-09-13 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Schaaf)--(0031S07.19S) | |
2011-09-13 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(0031S07.16S) | |
2011-09-12 | SS for SCS S offered (Mayer)--(0031S.07F) | |
2011-09-12 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-09-07 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-09-07 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (0031S.02C) | |
2011-09-07 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-09-07 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-09-06 | S First Read--SB 8-Mayer |