MO SB774 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred to H Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-13 - Referred to H Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Title
Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Dempsey [R] | Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-13 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-13 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-13 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin |
2014-05-08 | House | Voted to Return to Committee of Origin |
2014-05-08 | House | Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-14 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-10 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-08 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-04-08 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaefer)--(5385S06.01S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-08 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Dempsey)--(5385S.06F) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-03-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (5385S.05C) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | S First Read--SB 774-Dempsey |