MO SB761 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to access to public records
Title
Creates provisions relating to access to public records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2022-05-13 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-05-03 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-20 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-04-13 | Senate | SS#2, as amended, S adopted |
2022-04-13 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 S offered & adopted (Onder)--(3550S03.01S) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | SS#2 S offered (Brown)--(3550S.03F) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (Eigel)--(3550S02.11S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & Ruled out of order (Eigel)--(3550S02.01S) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | SS S offered (Brown)--(3550S.02F) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |