MO SB677 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to school accreditation for failing school districts
Title
Modifies provisions relating to school accreditation for failing school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-04-23 | H Second Read | |
2012-04-19 | H First Read (w/EC) | |
2012-04-19 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-04-02 | Perfected | |
2012-04-02 | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2012-04-02 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(5303S06.13S) | |
2012-04-02 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn | |
2012-04-02 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-02 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Lembke)--(5303S06.11S) | |
2012-04-02 | SS for SCS S offered (Pearce)--(5303S.06F) | |
2012-03-26 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-02-22 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (5303S.03C) | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2012-01-17 | S First Read--SB 677-Pearce |