MO SB664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to utilities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to utilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-12 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-11 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2020-05-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2020-05-05 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2020-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2020-03-09 | House | H Second Read |
2020-03-05 | House | H First Read |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 664-Burlison |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |