MO SB64 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of law relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions of law relating to health care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 64 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 64 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 64 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 64 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 118 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 64 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 106 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 64 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - House - House: SB 64 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 118 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | In Conference |
2021-05-13 | House | H distributes CCS#2--(0506S.08S) |
2021-05-13 | House | H distributes CCR#2--(0506S08.1SR) |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Rehder, Wieland, Rowden, Rizzo, Arthur |
2021-05-13 | House | House conferees re-appointed: Christofanelli, Smith (163), Stephens (128), Appelbaum, Lewis (25) |
2021-05-13 | House | H grants further conference |
2021-05-13 | House | S requests H grant further conference |
2021-05-13 | House | H distributes CCS--(0506S.07S) |
2021-05-13 | House | H distributes CCR--(0506S07.1SR) |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Rehder, Wieland, Rowden, Rizzo, Arthur |
2021-05-13 | House | House conferees appointed: Christofanelli, Smith (163), Stephens (128), Appelbaum, Lewis (25) |
2021-05-13 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2021-05-12 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2021-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2021-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2021-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-163)--(0506H04.27H) |
2021-05-10 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2021-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2021-03-22 | House | H Second Read |
2021-03-11 | House | H First Read |
2021-03-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Hoskins)--(0506S02.02S) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | SS S offered (Rehder)--(0506S.02F) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |