MO SB631 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 631-Cunningham (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 631-Cunningham (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Amy Hestir Student Protection Act
Title
Creates the Amy Hestir Student Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SCS for SB 631-Cunningham (In Fiscal Oversight) | |
2010-04-15 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-04-15 | Motion to reconsider Third Reading Vote S adopted | |
2010-04-15 | Motion to reconsider the motion by which the title was agreed to S adopted | |
2010-04-15 | Motion to reconsider the vote by which the bill was laid on table S adopted | |
2010-04-15 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-04-12 | Perfected | |
2010-04-12 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-04-12 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Days)--(3358S06.02S) | |
2010-04-12 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-01 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-03-17 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3358S.06C) | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 631-Cunningham | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |