MO SB63 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all tax credit programs created on or after August 28, 2013, to comply with the Tax Credit Accountability Act of 2004
Title
Requires all tax credit programs created on or after August 28, 2013, to comply with the Tax Credit Accountability Act of 2004
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 63-Schmitt |
2012-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=16953917 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB63.pdf |