MO SB627 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SB 627-Justus (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SB 627-Justus (In Fiscal Oversight)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides the opportunity for information regarding immunization for the Human Papilloma Virus
Title
Provides the opportunity for information regarding immunization for the Human Papilloma Virus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Third Reading--SB 627-Justus (In Fiscal Oversight) | |
2010-02-16 | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Perfected | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-09 | Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 627-Justus | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |