MO SB621 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Special Standing Committee on General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred H Special Standing Committee on General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to Digital Cadastral Parcel Mapping
Title
Modifies provisions relating to Digital Cadastral Parcel Mapping
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred H Special Standing Committee on General Laws Committee | |
2010-03-01 | H Second Read | |
2010-02-25 | H First Read | |
2010-02-25 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Perfected | |
2010-02-22 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-02-11 | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-02 | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 621-Lager | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |