MO SB59 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 59-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 59-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the process for filling vacancies in certain statewide and General Assembly offices
Title
Modifies the process for filling vacancies in certain statewide and General Assembly offices
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 59-Dixon |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 59-Dixon |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=42 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB59.pdf |