MO SB589 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the current ban on carrying concealed firearms in higher education institutions
Title
Removes the current ban on carrying concealed firearms in higher education institutions
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 589-Dixon and Sater |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246616 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB589.pdf |