MO SB54 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to insurance companies
Title
Enacts provisions relating to insurance companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 54 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 54 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 54 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 54 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 54 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 54 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: SB 54 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 54 (HA 1) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House: SB 54 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 139 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2019-05-16 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Crawford)--(0295S03.1SR) |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2019-05-16 | House | H distributes CCR (0295S03.1SR) |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Crawford, Wieland, Burlison, Walsh, Sifton |
2019-05-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Muntzel, Roden, Porter, Clemens, Chappelle-Nadal |
2019-05-15 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2019-05-13 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2019-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2019-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(0295H02.04H) |
2019-05-08 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2019-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2019-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2019-03-27 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-26 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee - Consent |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Insurance and Banking Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 54-Crawford |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |