MO SB529 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the retention of sales tax for the sales of admission tickets to certain events
Title
Authorizes the retention of sales tax for the sales of admission tickets to certain events
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | S First Read |