MO SB5 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies distribution of traffic fines and court costs collected by municipal courts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies distribution of traffic fines and court costs collected by municipal courts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-09SenateSigned by Governor
2015-05-27SenateDelivered to Governor
2015-05-27SenateSigned by House Speaker
2015-05-27SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2015-05-27SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2015-05-07SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2015-05-07SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2015-05-07SenateCCR H adopted
2015-05-07SenateBill laid over
2015-05-07SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2015-05-07SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2015-05-06HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2015-05-06HouseCCR S offered & adopted (0455S18.1SR)
2015-05-06HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2015-05-06HouseH distributes CCR (0455S18.1SR)
2015-04-28HouseS conferees appointed: Schmitt, Schaefer, Dixon, Chappelle-Nadal, Holsman
2015-04-28HouseH conferees appointed: Curtman, Cornejo, Austin, Pierson, McCann Beatty
2015-04-28HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2015-04-27HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2015-04-27HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2015-04-22HouseH Third Read and Passed
2015-04-22HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2015-04-22HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(0455H13.23H)
2015-04-22HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Parkinson)--(0455H13.01F)
2015-04-22HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(0445H13.27H)
2015-04-21HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2015-04-21HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2015-04-20HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2015-04-20HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) Committee
2015-04-20HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) Committee
2015-04-14HouseReferred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) Committee
2015-04-14HouseReported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee w/HCA 1
2015-04-14HouseVoted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee w/HCA 1
2015-04-08HouseHearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
2015-03-17HouseReferred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
2015-02-18HouseH Second Read
2015-02-17HouseH First Read
2015-02-12SenateS Third Read and Passed
2015-02-10SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2015-02-10SenatePerfected
2015-02-10SenateSS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2015-02-10SenateSA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(0455S09.17S)
2015-02-10SenateSA 4 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2015-02-10SenateSA 2 to SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Riddle)--(0455S09.15S)
2015-02-10SenateSA 1 to SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(0455S09.14S)
2015-02-10SenateSA 4 to SS for SCS S offered (Wasson)--(0455S09.08S)
2015-02-10SenateSA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0455S09.04S)
2015-02-10SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & ruled out of order (Schaaf)--(0455S07.04S)
2015-02-10SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(0455S09.06S)
2015-02-10SenateSS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(0455S.09F)
2015-02-05SenateReported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
2015-02-04SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (0455S.07C)
2015-01-21SenateHearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2015-01-13SenateSecond Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2015-01-07SenateS First Read--SB 5-Schmitt, et al
2014-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback