MO SB472 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-19 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the provisions of certain tax credit programs and requires the Department of Revenue to apply any increase in revenue generated to a decrease in the corporate income tax rate
Title
Modifies the provisions of certain tax credit programs and requires the Department of Revenue to apply any increase in revenue generated to a decrease in the corporate income tax rate
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-19 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 472-Kraus | |
2011-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=47 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SB472.pdf |