MO SB466 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the membership of the Missouri Housing Development Commission and Missouri Development Finance Board
Title
Modifies the membership of the Missouri Housing Development Commission and Missouri Development Finance Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Economic Development Committee w/SCS |
2021-03-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee (2152S.03C) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | S First Read |