MO SB386 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to hemp extract
Title
Modifies provisions relating to hemp extract
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Continued - Action Postponed |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2015-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2015-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2015-04-27 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-23 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-23 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-04-14 | Senate | SS#2 S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(0274S.10F) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-01 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Schaaf)--(0274S08.03S) |
2015-04-01 | Senate | SS S offered (Keaveny)--(0274S.08F) |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 386-Keaveny |