MO SB378 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the use of paper ballots in public elections
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the use of paper ballots in public elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | S First Read |