MO SB36 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows employees of certain employers to take a leave of absence for civil air patrol emergency service duty or counter narcotics missions
Title
Allows employees of certain employers to take a leave of absence for civil air patrol emergency service duty or counter narcotics missions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-05-04 | Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-05-02 | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-12 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-11 | H First Read | |
2011-04-11 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Perfected | |
2011-04-04 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-14 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2011-02-09 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 36-Lembke | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |