MO SB327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Title
Modifies provisions relating to child protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 327 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 125 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 327 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: SB 327 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 121 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | S Bills with H Amendments |
2021-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2021-05-13 | House | HCS#2, as amended, H adopted |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 4 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(1595H10.09H) |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 3 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Smith-155)--(1595H10.03H) |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 2 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Veit)--(1595H10.05H) |
2021-05-13 | House | HA 1 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Coleman-97)--(1595H10.12H) |
2021-05-11 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2021-05-11 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2021-05-10 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-10 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-05-07 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-05-07 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-05-05 | House | Returned to H Emerging Issues |
2021-05-05 | House | Voted to return to committee origin |
2021-05-03 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - Action postponed |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2021-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues |
2021-04-08 | House | H Second Read |
2021-04-07 | House | H First Read |
2021-04-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Perfected |
2021-03-30 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered & adopted (Arthur)--(1595S03.09S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(1595S03.04S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | SS S offered (Koenig)--(1595S.03F) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled |