MO SB315 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires in-person notice of most traffic violations, and prohibits automated traffic enforcement and fine collection
Title
Requires in-person notice of most traffic violations, and prohibits automated traffic enforcement and fine collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | S First Read--SB 315-Eigel |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57688333 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB315.pdf |