MO SB300 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 300-Silvey, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - In Conference--SCS for SB 300-Silvey, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to retirement benefits
Title
Modifies provisions relating to retirement benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Silvey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | In Conference--SCS for SB 300-Silvey, with HCS, as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-05-07 | House | H distributes CCR (1654S04.1SR) |
2015-05-05 | House | S conferees appointed: Silvey, Parson, Schaaf, Keaveny, Curls |
2015-05-04 | House | H conferees appointed: Leara, Johnson, Taylor, Webber, Kendrick |
2015-05-04 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2015-04-30 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2015-04-30 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2015-04-30 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-30 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lair)--(1645H03.06H) |
2015-04-30 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (King)--(1645H03.07H) |
2015-04-30 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bernskoetter)--(1654H03.09H) |
2015-04-30 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Richardson)--(1654H.04H) |
2015-04-30 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lair)--(1654H03.05H) |
2015-04-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation (Pursuant to H Rule 27.6) Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Pensions Committee w/HCAs 1 & 2 |
2015-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Pensions Committee w/Amendments |
2015-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Pensions Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred H Pensions Committee |
2015-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-02 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-03-31 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws and Pensions Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-03-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws and Pensions Committee (1654S.02C) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2015-01-26 | Senate | S First Read--SB 300-Silvey |