MO SB28 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - No motion made in House to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - No motion made in House to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines "misconduct" and "good cause" for the purposes of disqualification from unemployment benefits
Title
Redefines "misconduct" and "good cause" for the purposes of disqualification from unemployment benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | No motion made in House to override Governor's veto |
2013-09-11 | House | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto (Kraus) |
2013-07-02 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-29 | House | Laid over |
2013-04-29 | House | Taken up for Third Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-14 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SS S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(0288S.02F) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-13 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Kraus)--(0288S01.01S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 28-Kraus |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |