MO SB279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds certain forms to the list of documents sufficient to demonstrate eligibility for a veteran designation on an applicant's driver's license or non-driver identification card
Title
Adds certain forms to the list of documents sufficient to demonstrate eligibility for a veteran designation on an applicant's driver's license or non-driver identification card
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: SB 279 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2017-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2017-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2017-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2017-04-11 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2017-03-24 | House | H Second Read |
2017-03-16 | House | H First Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2017-03-16 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee w/SCS - Consent |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee - Consent vote adopted (1191S.05C) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (1191S.05C) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 279-Kraus |