MO SB271 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires 911 operators to receive training regarding self-defense and defense of others
Title
Requires 911 operators to receive training regarding self-defense and defense of others
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 271-Nieves |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=17914884 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SB271.pdf |