MO SB266 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 266-Schaefer, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits municipalities from providing certain services already being provided within the boundaries of the municipality without a vote of the people

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits municipalities from providing certain services already being provided within the boundaries of the municipality without a vote of the people

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-15SenateS Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 266-Schaefer, with SCS
2015-04-27SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2015-04-16SenateReported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
2015-03-18SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (1241S.05C)
2015-02-18SenateHearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2015-02-11SenateSecond Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2015-01-20SenateS First Read--SB 266-Schaefer

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback