MO SB258 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 258-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 258-Munzlinger
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies civil procedure for joinder, intervention, and venue in civil actions
Title
Modifies civil procedure for joinder, intervention, and venue in civil actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 258-Munzlinger |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Government Reform Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 258-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57611592 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB258.pdf |