MO SB250 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires sexual assault offenders to complete certain programs prior to being eligible for parole and prohibits them from living near child care facilities
Title
Requires sexual assault offenders to complete certain programs prior to being eligible for parole and prohibits them from living near child care facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] | Rep. Rodney Schad [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-13 | CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-13 | CCR#2 H adopted | |
2011-05-12 | CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-12 | CCR#2 S offered & adopted | |
2011-05-11 | H submits CCR#2 | |
2011-05-10 | H conferees appointed: Schad, Cierpiot, Higdon, Colona, Swearingen | |
2011-05-10 | S conferees appointed: Kehoe, Goodman, Engler, Callahan, Keaveny | |
2011-05-10 | H refuses to recede and grants conference | |
2011-05-10 | S requests H recede or grant conference | |
2011-05-10 | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended | |
2011-05-09 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-09 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-09 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schad)--(1451L03.03H) | |
2011-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-21 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-21 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-21 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-11 | Commitee Vote Reconsidered H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-17 | H First Read | |
2011-03-17 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Perfected, as amended | |
2011-03-16 | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(1451S01.01S) | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-09 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2011-02-09 | S First Read--SB 250-Kehoe |