MO SB198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-02 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts a regulatory scheme for weigh station and inspection site bypass services
Title
Enacts a regulatory scheme for weigh station and inspection site bypass services
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Hearing to be Continued S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 198-Schaaf |
2016-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57151577 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB198.pdf |