MO SB185 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-12 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals chapter 291, regulating industrial inspections by the Director of the Inspection Section
Title
Repeals chapter 291, regulating industrial inspections by the Director of the Inspection Section
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee w/SCS |
2023-03-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (1105S.02C) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2023-01-04 | Senate | S First Read |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |