MO SB180 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates certain state recognized days, weeks, and months
Title
Designates certain state recognized days, weeks, and months
Sponsors
Sen. Jolie Justus [D] | Sen. Will Kraus [R] | Rep. Noel Torpey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-11 | HCS H defeated | |
2011-05-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-03-03 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-02 | H First Read | |
2011-03-02 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Perfected | |
2011-02-24 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-08 | Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Hearing Cancelled S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-26 | S First Read--SB 180-Kraus and Justus |