MO SB169 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a food or merchandise container shall not be deemed to be misleading, misbranded, or unfairly marketed if the container is filled to less than its capacity if certain criteria are present
Title
Provides that a food or merchandise container shall not be deemed to be misleading, misbranded, or unfairly marketed if the container is filled to less than its capacity if certain criteria are present
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |