MO SB161 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Delivered to Governor (w/EC) | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-27 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-04-27 | S concurs in HCS, as amended | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to reconsider adoption of HCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2011-04-27 | Motion to reconsider Third Reading Vote, S adopted | |
2011-04-27 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-27 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-27 | S concurs in HCS, as amended | |
2011-04-27 | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2011-04-27 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-04-27 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Quinn)--(0993L02.08H) | |
2011-04-27 | HA 1 to HCS H adopted | |
2011-04-27 | Placed back on Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Loehner)--(0993L02.02L) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-04-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-04-05 | Hearing Conducted H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-03-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-17 | H First Read | |
2011-03-17 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Perfected | |
2011-03-07 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-21 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2011-02-16 | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - Consent | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-24 | S First Read--SB 161-Munzlinger |