MO SB149 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates state and local sales and use tax exemptions for data storage centers and allows municipalities to enter into loan agreements, or sell, lease, or mortgage municipal property for a technology business facility project
Title
Creates state and local sales and use tax exemptions for data storage centers and allows municipalities to enter into loan agreements, or sell, lease, or mortgage municipal property for a technology business facility project
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2015-03-19 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-03-19 | House | HCS H adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-03-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention Committee w/HCA 1 |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing Conducted H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred H Economic Development & Business Attraction & Retention Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-17 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2015-02-10 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Wasson)--(0754S.08F) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2015-02-05 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (0754S.04C) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 149-Parson |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled |