MO SB116 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Economic Development Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to workforce development
Title
Modifies provisions relating to workforce development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 116-Cierpiot |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB116.pdf |