MO SB116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an exemption from the proof of residency and domicile for school registration for students whose parents are stationed out of state
Title
Creates an exemption from the proof of residency and domicile for school registration for students whose parents are stationed out of state
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans Committee - Consent |
2015-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans Committee - Consent |
2015-04-14 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred H Veterans Committee |
2015-03-02 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-26 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - Consent |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 116-Kraus |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |