MO SB1058 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 6th of every year as the "Advanced Practice Registered Nurses Appreciation Day" in Missouri
Title
Designates May 6th of every year as the "Advanced Practice Registered Nurses Appreciation Day" in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |