MO SB1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to workers' compensation
Title
Modifies the law relating to workers' compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | H submits CCR |
2013-05-14 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed (0225S.12S) |
2013-05-14 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (0225S12.1SR) |
2013-05-06 | House | S conferees appointed: Rupp, Cunningham, Parson, Sifton, Walsh |
2013-05-06 | House | H conferees appointed: Richardson, Lant, Webber |
2013-05-06 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-02 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-02 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-05-02 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-02 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & defeated (Hummel)--(0225H09.11H) |
2013-05-01 | House | Laid over |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haahr)--(0225H09.02H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & defeated (Kelly-45)--(0225H09.01H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schatz)--(0225H09.25H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(0225H09.08H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Conway)--(0225H09.24H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (White)--(0225H09.12H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Molendorp)--(0225H09.18H) |
2013-05-01 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Richardson)--(0225H09.21H) |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred H Workforce Development & Workplace Safety Committee |
2013-02-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-14 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 8 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0225S06.15S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 7 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Sifton)--(0225S06.11S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 6 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Walsh)--(0225S06.02F) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 5 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Walsh)--(0225S06.08S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 4 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Walsh)--(0225S06.07S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0225S06.09S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0225S06.01F) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0225S06.03S) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SS#2 for SCS S offered (Rupp)--(0225S.06F) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2013-02-12 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Taken up for Perfection |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered (Walsh)--(0225S02.07S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S defeated |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Walsh)--(0225S03.19S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Sifton)--(0225S03.02F) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Holsman)--(0225S03.01F) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Rupp)--(0225S.03F) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S withdrawn |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-04 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SCS S offered (Holsman)--(0225S02.01F) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Rupp)--(0225S02.10S) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(0225S02.11S) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-01-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee - (0225S.02C) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 1-Rupp |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |