MO HJR53 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment regarding the right to life

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes a constitutional amendment regarding the right to life

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-04-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-04-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-04-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-04-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-13HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback