MO HJR51 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the voter approval requirement for constitutional amendments.
Title
Modifies the voter approval requirement for constitutional amendments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HJR51&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/2382H.01I.pdf |