MO HJR3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to a property tax exemption for certain disabled veterans
Title
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of Missouri relating to a property tax exemption for certain disabled veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |