MO HJR25 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding taxes by phasing out the income tax and replacing it with a sales tax
Title
Changes the laws regarding taxes by phasing out the income tax and replacing it with a sales tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HJR25&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HJR0025I.htm |