MO HCR48 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 8, 2021, as Holocaust Remembrance Day
Title
Designates April 8, 2021, as Holocaust Remembrance Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-31 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2021-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |