MO HCR46 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Referred: Rules (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Referred: Rules (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Kansas City as host of FUTURALLIA KC 2011 event for small and medium business leaders
Title
Recognizes Kansas City as host of FUTURALLIA KC 2011 event for small and medium business leaders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Referred: Rules (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Referred: International Trade and Job Creation (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Offered (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR46&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HCR0046I.htm |