MO HCR34 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Submits to Congress a proposed federal balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution
Title
Submits to Congress a proposed federal balanced budget amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Icet [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-02-11 | Second Read and Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics (S) | |
2010-02-10 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-02-09 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 121 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 02 | |
2010-02-09 | HCS Adopted (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2010-02-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-01-27 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-01-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred: Budget (H) | |
2010-01-25 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |